CA SB760 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-25 - June 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-25 - June 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 670.1 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to state highways.
Title
State highways: permits: improvements.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Asm. Richard Bloom [D] |
Asm. Laura Friedman [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB760 Wiener et al (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Assembly | June 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | June 11 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 4105.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4056.) (January 18). |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Set for hearing January 18. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | January 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Set for hearing January 16. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 4007.) (January 9). |
2018-01-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Set for hearing January 9. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14007.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 14033 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 14033.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 14526.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14526.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14526.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14526.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 14526.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 167 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 1805.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 670.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 891.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 906.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |