CA SB759 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 446, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 446, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3019 of the Elections Code, relating to elections, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Elections: vote by mail ballots.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike McGuire [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB759 McGuire et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 759 McGuire Third Reading Urgency By MULLIN (Y: 55 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 759 McGuire Third Reading Urgency By MULLIN (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 759 McGuire Senate Third Reading By MULLIN Amendment Set #1 (Y: 53 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB759 McGuire (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 759 McGuire Third Reading Urgency By MULLIN (Y: 55 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 759 McGuire Third Reading Urgency By MULLIN (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 759 McGuire Senate Third Reading By MULLIN Amendment Set #1 (Y: 53 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB759 McGuire (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 446, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 5874.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Urgency clause adopted. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 25. Page 6600.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Reconsideration granted. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Mullin. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 6514.) |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 6294.) |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 8). |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 27). |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | June 13 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 4111.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4056.) (January 18). |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Set for hearing January 18. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | January 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Set for hearing January 16. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 4005.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Set for hearing January 9. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | April 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 3019 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3723.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3724 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3724.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3724.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3726 | Amended Code | Citation Text |