CA SB759 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 191, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 191, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 2933.6 of the Penal Code, relating to prisoners.
Title
Prisoners: segregation housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Joel Anderson [R] | Sen. Loni Hancock [D] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Sen. Carol Liu [D] |
Sen. Holly Mitchell [D] | Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D] | Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB759 Anderson Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-04 - Assembly - SB 759 Anderson Senate Third Reading By QUIRK (Y: 41 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB759 Anderson (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-04 - Assembly - SB 759 Anderson Senate Third Reading By QUIRK (Y: 41 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB759 Anderson (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 191, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-08-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 4862.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-04 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 41. Noes 31. Page 5717.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 6.) (June 29). |
2016-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-14 | Assembly | July 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 1306.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1159.) (May 28). |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 824.) (April 28). |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 2696 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 2933.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |