CA SB756 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 101, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 101, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1202.4 of the Penal Code, relating to restitution, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Restitution: noneconomic losses: child sexual abuse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-06 - Assembly - SB 756 Stern Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB756 Stern (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB756 Stern (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 101, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-07-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-07-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2475.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 955.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 913.) (May 1). |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 749.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1202.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |