CA SB752 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 3.7 (commencing with Section 8299) of Division 1 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
The California Master Plan on Tech Equity.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor, Public Employment and Retirement ] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor, Public Employment and Retirement ] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 801.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L., P.E. & R. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 773.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24 in L., P.E. & R. pending receipt. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on G.O. and L., P.E. & R. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8299 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |