CA SB752 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 362, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 362, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 31678.31 to the Government Code, relating to county employees' retirement, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
County employees' retirement: Orange County.
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Correa [D] | Asm. Jim Silva [R] | Asm. Jose Solorio [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-09-08 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB752 Correa Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-04 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-01 - Assembly - SB 752 Correa Third Reading Urgency By SILVA (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Senate - Special Consent #8 SB752 Wiggins (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-04 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-01 - Assembly - SB 752 Correa Third Reading Urgency By SILVA (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Senate - Special Consent #8 SB752 Wiggins (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 362, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by Governor. | |
2009-09-11 | Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m. | |
2009-09-08 | Urgency clause adopted. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2273.) To enrollment. | |
2009-09-04 | From committee: Pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10 be re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2227.) Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2301.) | |
2009-09-02 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. | |
2009-09-01 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2009-09-01 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2855.) To Senate. | |
2009-08-24 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 2711.) To third reading. | |
2009-08-18 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-17 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. | |
2009-07-23 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-15 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-13 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-09 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 8.) | |
2009-06-25 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-06-18 | To Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. | |
2009-06-03 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-06-03 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1189.) To Assembly. | |
2009-06-01 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-28 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 1074.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2009-05-22 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2009-05-08 | Set for hearing May 18. | |
2009-05-05 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-05-01 | Set for hearing May 11. | |
2009-04-28 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 685.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-22 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2009-03-19 | To Com. on P.E. & R. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-02-28 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |