CA SB751 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 670, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 6539.6 to the Government Code, relating to joint powers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint powers authorities: San Gabriel Valley Regional Housing Trust.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-06 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB751 Rubio et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Assembly - SB 751 Rubio Senate Third Reading By Blanca Rubio (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB751 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 670, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-09 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-17SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2019-09-06SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2611.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-06SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-09-05SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3037.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-08-30AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2019-06-27AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-06-27AssemblyFrom consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
2019-06-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2019-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 19).
2019-05-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2019-05-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-06SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 964.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2019-04-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 891.) (April 30).
2019-04-26SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2019-04-25SenateRe-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
2019-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 847.) (April 24).
2019-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-04-04SenateApril 10 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2019-04-03SenateRe-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HOUSING.
2019-03-27SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code6539.6New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback