CA SB751 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 202, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 202, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 44275.4 of, and to add Article 14 (commencing with Section 44401) to Chapter 2 of Part 25 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, the Education Code, relating to teachers.
Title
Teacher credentials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-02 - Senate - Special Consent #18 SB751 Romero (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Assembly - SB 751 Romero Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Senate - Special Consent #5 SB751 Romero (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Assembly - SB 751 Romero Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Senate - Special Consent #5 SB751 Romero (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 202, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by Governor. | |
2009-09-11 | Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m. | |
2009-09-02 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2131.) To enrollment. | |
2009-08-31 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-08-27 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2009-08-27 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2761.) To Senate. | |
2009-08-24 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-08-20 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.) | |
2009-06-24 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-06-23 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 17.) | |
2009-06-02 | To Com. on ED. | |
2009-05-18 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 931.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-14 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-13 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-12 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-05-05 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing May 11. | |
2009-05-04 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-04-28 | Set for hearing May 4. | |
2009-04-23 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-22 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 496.) | |
2009-03-25 | Set for hearing April 15. | |
2009-03-19 | To Com. on ED. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-02-28 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |