CA SB746 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 780, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 780, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 29180, 29182, and 29183 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Sections 16150, 29830, 33850, 33855, 33860, 33865, 33870, 33875, 33880, 33885, and 33895 of, the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms and ammunition: prohibited possession: transfer to licensed dealer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB746 Portantino Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 746 Portantino Senate Third Reading By QUIRK (Y: 59 N: 10 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB746 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 746 Portantino Senate Third Reading By QUIRK (Y: 59 N: 10 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB746 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 780, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 6024.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 10. Page 6766.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (August 16). |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | June 27 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 12). |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4116.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Set for hearing January 16. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4006.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Set for hearing January 9. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | March 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and B., P. & E.D. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 49458 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 16150 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26720 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 29180 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 29182 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 29183 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 29830 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 33850 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 33855 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 33860 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 33865 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 33870 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 33875 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 33880 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 33885 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 33895 | Amended Code | Citation Text |