CA SB742 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on September 11 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 14035.55 of the Government Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Intercity passenger rail services: motor carrier transportation of passengers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB742 Allen et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 742 Allen Senate Third Reading By Gray (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB742 Allen (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-11SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-09-10SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-06AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-06AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2019-09-06AssemblyAssembly Rule 69 suspended.
2019-08-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21).
2019-07-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-01AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-05-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-20SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1151.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-04-26SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2019-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 806.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-10SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2019-04-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-03-27SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code14035.55Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1501Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback