CA SB741 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-31 - Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 10. Page 5415.) Ordered to the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1276 and 1277 of the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Sections 103400, 103425, and 103426 of, to amend the heading of Article 7 (commencing with Section 103425) of Chapter 11 of Part 1 of Division 102 of, to add Section 103431 to, and to repeal and add Sections 103430, 103435, and 103440 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to vital records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change of gender and sex identifier.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - SB 741 Galgiani Senate Third Reading By Low (Y: 63 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB741 Galgiani Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB741 Galgiani (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-31 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 10. Page 5415.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-09-29 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2020-09-29 Vetoed by the Governor.
2020-09-08SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2020-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 7.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2020-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 10.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-24AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 20).
2020-08-11AssemblyAugust 11 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2020-08-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (August 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-07-09AssemblyJuly 9 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-06-10AssemblyReferred to Coms. on JUD. and HEALTH.
2019-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-20SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 1156.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-13SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 849.) (April 24).
2019-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-04-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 654.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 9.
2019-04-03SenateRe-referred to Coms. on JUD. and HEALTH.
2019-03-27SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback