CA SB74 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - Consideration of Governor's item veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - Consideration of Governor's item veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4626, 4627, 4639, 4640.6, and 4791 of, to add Sections 4620.3, 4622.5, 4625.5, 4626.5, 4629.5, 4629.7, 4648.12, 4648.14, and 4652.5 to, and to add Article 2.6 (commencing with Section 4659.10) to Chapter 5 of Division 4.5 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, and to amend Section 10 of Chapter 13 of the Third Extraordinary Session of the Statutes of 2009, relating to developmental services, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Developmental services.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-16 - Senate - F#36 SB74 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Assembly - SB 74 B.& F. R. Third Reading Urgency By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 58 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB74 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-16 - Assembly - SB 74 B.& F. R. Third Reading Urgency By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 58 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB74 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-06 | Consideration of Governor's item veto stricken from file. | |
2011-03-24 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's item veto pending. | |
2011-03-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 9, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-03-24 | Approved by the Governor with item veto. | |
2011-03-22 | Enrolled measure version corrected. Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:50 p.m. | |
2011-03-16 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 354.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-03-16 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 581.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-03-14 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2011-02-14 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-02-14 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 2. Page 165.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-02-10 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-01-11 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4620.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4622.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4625.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4626 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4626.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4627 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4629.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4629.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4639 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4640.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4648.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4648.14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4652.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4791 | Amended Code | Citation Text |