CA SB73 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 423.4 to the Government Code, relating to state emblems.
Title
Official state ship of exploration.
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] | Sen. Joel Anderson [R] | Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Asm. Rocky Chavez [R] |
Asm. Brian Maienschein [D] | Asm. Randy Voepel [R] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | May 9 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | (Corrected May 4). |
2017-05-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | April 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 423.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB73 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB73 |