CA SB726 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-24 - June 24 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-24 - June 24 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 205.5.1 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Property taxation: exemption: disabled veteran homeowners.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Archuleta [D] | Sen. Shannon Grove [R] | Sen. Marie Alvarado-Gil [D] | Asm. Phillip Chen [R] |
Asm. Laurie Davies [R] | Sen. Kelly Seyarto [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB726 Archuleta et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB726 Archuleta et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-24 | Assembly | June 24 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-07-10 | Assembly | July 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2023-06-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on M. & V.A. and REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and M. & V.A. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1304.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1181.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 855.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 684.) (April 12). |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | March 29 hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and M. & V.A. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 205.5.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |