CA SB725 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 179, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1001.80 of the Penal Code, relating to veterans, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans: pretrial diversion: driving privileges.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-20 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB725 Jackson et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Assembly - SB 725 Jackson Third Reading Urgency By JONES-SAWYER (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB725 Jackson Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 179, Statutes of 2017.
2017-08-07 Approved by the Governor.
2017-07-28SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
2017-07-20SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2128.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-07-18SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-07-17AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 2. Page 2576.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-07-03AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-07-03AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2017-06-14AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 13).
2017-06-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-05-04AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-04SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 950.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-04-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 749.) (April 18).
2017-03-17SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2017-03-16SenateApril 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-14SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1001.80Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback