CA SB719 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 163, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 163, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 14107 of the Government Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Department of Transportation: motor vehicle technologies testing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-16 - Assembly - SB 719 Hernandez Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB719 Hernandez (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB719 Hernandez (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 163, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-08-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2434.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8). |
2015-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 995.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 620.) (April 14). |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | April 7 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14107 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |