CA SB715 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 250, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 12525.3 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 11106, 11108.2, 26406, 27505, 27570, 28050, 28055, 28100, 28210, 28215, 28220, 28230, 29610, 29615, 29700, 29750, 31700, and 32000 of, to amend the heading of Article 1 (commencing with Section 29610) of Chapter 1 of Division 9 of Title 4 of Part 6 of, to add Sections 16685, 26537, 27963, 31833, and 31834 to, and to repeal and add Section 27945 of, the Penal Code, relating to criminal law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-10 - Assembly - SB 715 Portantino Senate Third Reading By McCarty (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB715 Portantino et al. Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-09-03 - Assembly - SB 715 Portantino Senate Third Reading By McCarty Amend By MCCARTY Set #1 (Y: 52 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB715 Portantino et al (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-23 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 250, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-23 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-15 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
2021-09-10SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 9.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-09-10SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-09-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2021-09-03AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2021-09-03AssemblyRead third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 11.)
2021-08-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26).
2021-08-19AssemblyAugust 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2021-07-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-21AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-06-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-06-02SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 1378.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1201.) (May 20).
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-04SenateMay 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 3.
2021-04-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 861.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-24SenateSet for hearing April 20.
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-22SenateRead first time.
2021-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2021-02-19SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12525.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code11106Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code11108.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code16685New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code26406Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code26537New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code27505Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code27570Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code27963New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code28050Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code28055Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code28100Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code28210Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code28215Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code28220Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code28230Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code29610Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code29615Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code29700Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code29750Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code31700Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code31833New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code31834New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code32000Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback