CA SB715 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - April 24 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 796.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend the heading of Chapter 3.9 (commencing with Section 12147) of Part 2 of Division 2 of, and to add Section 12148 to, the Public Contract Code, relating to the University of California.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

University of California retirement plans: asset managers: contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-24-2019]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateApril 24 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 796.) Reconsideration granted.
2019-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-04-10SenateRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-03-28SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Contract Code12147Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Contract Code12148New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback