CA SB715 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 43013.4 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to vehicular air pollution.
Title
Vehicular air pollution: regulations: exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 715 Delgado Senate Third Reading By CALDERON (Y: 57 N: 14 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB715 Delgado Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Assembly - (Y: 15 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-08-24 - Assembly - SB 715 Newman Senate Third Reading By CALDERON Amend By CERVANTES Set #1 (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB715 Newman (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB715 Delgado Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Assembly - (Y: 15 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-08-24 - Assembly - SB 715 Newman Senate Third Reading By CALDERON Amend By CERVANTES Set #1 (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB715 Newman (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-30 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2018-09-30 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 2. Page 6168.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 6200.) |
2018-08-31 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5112.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2018-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (August 29). |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 6549.) |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 78 suspended. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bonta. |
2017-06-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 955.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 914.) (May 1). |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 43013.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 5503 | Amended Code | Citation Text |