CA SB715 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-01 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-01 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 51247 of, and to add Section 66474.5 to, the Government Code, and to amend Section 426 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to agricultural land.
Title
Agricultural land: Williamson Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Juan Arambula [D] | Asm. Wesley Chesbro [D] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Sen. Lois Wolk [D] |
Asm. Mariko Yamada [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB715 Wolk (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-01 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-06-18 | To Coms. on AGRI. and NAT. RES. | |
2009-06-03 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-06-03 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 1173.) To Assembly. | |
2009-06-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2009-05-07 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-06 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 809.) | |
2009-05-04 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2009-03-24 | Set for hearing May 6. | |
2009-03-19 | To Com. on L. GOV. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-02-28 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |