CA SB707 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 14005.274 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: Denti-Cal Advisory Group.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 707 Cannella Senate Third Reading By MAYES (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB707 Cannella et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB707 Cannella et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB707 Cannella et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB707 Cannella et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-26 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2018-09-26 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6150.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4112.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4056.) (January 18). |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Set for hearing January 18. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | January 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Set for hearing January 16. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4020.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Set for hearing January 10. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14005.274 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |