CA SB707 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 766, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 766, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 626.9 and 30310 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: gun-free school zone.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-02 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB707 Wolk Concurrence (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Assembly - SB 707 Wolk Senate Third Reading By DODD (Y: 54 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB707 Wolk (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Assembly - SB 707 Wolk Senate Third Reading By DODD (Y: 54 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB707 Wolk (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 766, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 2424.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 2726.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27). |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 1210.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1159.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | April 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 596.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 30310 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 626.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |