CA SB706 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 39712 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Greenhouse Gas Reduction Fund: alternative fuels.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-11 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-28SenateMay 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2015-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 28.
2015-05-11SenateMay 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2015-05-05SenateSet for hearing May 11.
2015-04-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 859.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-17SenateSet for hearing April 29.
2015-04-16SenateRe-referred to Com. on E.Q.
2015-04-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2015-03-19SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2015-03-02SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
2015-02-27SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code39712Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code25200Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback