CA SB704 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 495, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1091 of the Government Code, relating to public officers and employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public officers and employees: conflict of interest: contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-01 - Senate - Special Consent #9 SB704 Gaines (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - SB 704 Gaines Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB704 Gaines (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-10-04 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 495, Statutes of 2015.
2015-10-04 Approved by the Governor.
2015-09-03SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
2015-09-01SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2379.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2015-08-31SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2015-08-27SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2015-08-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2639.) Ordered to the Senate.
2015-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2015-08-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19).
2015-07-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-07-08AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2015-06-15AssemblyJuly 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-06-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2015-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2015-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1068.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2015-05-19SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-05-18SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2015-05-08SenateSet for hearing May 18.
2015-04-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 816.) (April 29).
2015-04-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2015-04-22SenateSet for hearing April 29.
2015-04-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2015-03-19SenateReferred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E. & C.A.
2015-03-02SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
2015-02-27SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code1091Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code1091.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_704&sess=1516&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_704_bill_20150227_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_704_bill_20150406_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_704_bill_20150422_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_704_bill_20150430_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_704_bill_20150708_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_704_bill_20150901_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_704_bill_20151004_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_704_vote_20150429_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_704_vote_20150522_1029AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_704_vote_20150715_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_704_vote_20150819_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_704_vote_20150827_1105AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_704_vote_20150901_0354PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback