CA SB7 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 794, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 794, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1782 to the Labor Code, relating to public works.
Title
Public works: charter cities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-06 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB7 Steinberg Concurrence (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-04 - Assembly - SB7 Steinberg Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS (Y: 52 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Labor and Employment (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB7 Steinberg (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-04 - Assembly - SB7 Steinberg Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS (Y: 52 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Labor and Employment (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB7 Steinberg (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 794, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2013-09-06 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 2172.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-05 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 22. Page 2869.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 30). |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-07 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2013-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and L. & E. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 1094.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1004.) (May 23). |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 291.) (March 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Set for hearing March 13. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2012-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2012-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1724 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1782 | New Code | See Bill Text |