CA SB699 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - June 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - June 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3301 of the Government Code, relating to public employment.
Title
Public Safety Officers Procedural Bill of Rights Act: coroners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB699 Galgiani et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB699 Galgiani et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Assembly | June 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 31). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1333.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Published May 26 at 10 a.m. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1189.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 856.) (April 25). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 627.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and PUB. S. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 3301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21181 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21189.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21189.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 14602.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 23109 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 23109.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |