CA SB698 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 23152.1 to the Vehicle Code, relating to driving under the influence.
Title
Driving under the influence: alcohol and marijuana.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 856.) (April 25). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | April 18 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | April 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 23152.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 23573.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |