CA SB697 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 612, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 612, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 280.5, 281, 309.7, 311.4, 321.6, 364, 379.7, 421, 740.3, 747, 765, 785, 846, 873, 958.5, 960, 2851, 2881, 2891, 5387, 5920, 5960, 7661, 7712, 7912, and 8283 of, to amend the headings of Article 5 (commencing with Section 581) of Chapter 3 of, and Article 11 (commencing with Section 910) of Chapter 4 of, Part 1 of Division 1 of, to amend and renumber Sections 321.7, 326, 326.5, 399.19, 432.5, 747.6, 748, 765.6, 911, 915, 5006, 5012, 7711, and 8367 of, to amend, renumber, and add Section 910 of, to add Sections 590, 910.1, 910.3, 910.6, 911.1, 912, 912.2, 913, 913.5, 913.11, 913.12, 913.13, 914, 914.1, 914.2, 914.3, 914.4, 914.5, 914.6, 914.7. 916, 916.1, 916.4, 919, and 920 to, and to repeal Section 5385.5 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to public utilities.
Title
Public Utilities Commission Accountability Act of 2015: reports: audits: electrical restructuring: charter-party carriers of passengers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB697 Hertzberg Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Assembly - SB 697 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB697 Hertzberg (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Assembly - SB 697 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB697 Hertzberg (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 612, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-15 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 a.m. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2677.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3030.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-24 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Cristina Garcia. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19). |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 6). |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 949.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 884.) (May 4). |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 724.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |