CA SB696 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 53398.52 of, and to add Section 53398.52.1 to, the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Enhanced infrastructure financing districts: housing: underutilized or deteriorated retail property: covenants and restrictions: eminent domain.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2021-09-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Senate Rules Suspended. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and JUD. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53398.52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53398.52.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |