CA SB695 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - June 27 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 30 of the Business and Professions Code, to add Section 44339.5 to the Education Code, and to amend Sections 1337.2, 1736.1, 1797.170, 1797.171, 1797.172, 106995, and 114870 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to professions and vocations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professions and vocations: applications and renewals: individual tax identification number.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB695 Lara et al (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27AssemblyJune 27 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-31AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 31). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-05-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-05-16AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-04-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-01-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-01-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 4110.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-01-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-16SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-01-11SenateSet for hearing January 16.
2018-01-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4019.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-12-21SenateSet for hearing January 10.
2017-06-14SenateRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-06-07SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-06-07SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-06-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-03-29SenateApril 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-14SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code1247.61Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code30Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code44339.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code106995Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code114870Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1337.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1736.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1797.170Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1797.171Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1797.172Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code13125Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code290Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code290.006Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code290.45Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code290.46Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code290.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code4852.01Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code4852.03Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback