CA SB694 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 545, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 545, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5272.1 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to outdoor advertising.
Title
Outdoor advertising: transit stations.
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Correa [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB694 Correa Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-06 - Assembly - SB 694 Correa Senate Third Reading By WAGNER (Y: 65 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB694 Correa (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-06 - Assembly - SB 694 Correa Senate Third Reading By WAGNER (Y: 65 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB694 Correa (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 545, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 2280.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-06 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 7. Page 2973.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 2833.) Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 14). |
2013-07-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 1090.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 759.) (April 30). |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. Set for hearing April 30. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 5203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5272.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |