CA SB693 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 466, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 14 (commencing with Section 5796) to Chapter 4 of Division 5 of the Public Resources Code, relating to the Lower San Gabriel River Recreation and Park District.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lower San Gabriel River Recreation and Park District.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB693 Mendoza Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Assembly - SB 693 Mendoza Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, C (Y: 56 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB693 Mendoza (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-03 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 466, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-03 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-19SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-09-13SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2845.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-13SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-09-12AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 20. Page 3202.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-09-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1).
2017-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2017-06-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 28).
2017-06-20AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2017-06-15AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and W.,P., & W.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 1310.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1189.) (May 25).
2017-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-16SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2017-05-16SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateMay 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2017-04-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 885.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-19SenateSet for hearing April 26.
2017-04-17SenateApril 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-21SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code5796New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback