CA SB693 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 774, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 774, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17250.25 and 17407.5 of the Education Code, to amend Section 25536.7 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 10191, 20119.1, 20119.3, 20155.4, and 22164 of, to repeal Section 20155.2 of, and to add Chapter 2.9 (commencing with Section 2600) to Part 1 of Division 2 of, the Public Contract Code, relating to employment.
Title
Public contracts: skilled and trained workforce.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB693 Hueso Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 693 Hueso Senate Third Reading By RIDLEY-THOMAS (Y: 64 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Labor and Employment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB693 Hueso (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 693 Hueso Senate Third Reading By RIDLEY-THOMAS (Y: 64 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Labor and Employment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB693 Hueso (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 774, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 5371.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 5317.) |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Set for hearing August 23. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5217.) Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 14. Page 5888.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 4.) (August 3). |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 22). |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 9). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2016-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2015-04-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 1. Page 557.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 509.) (April 7). |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 17250.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 17407.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25536.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 10191 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20119.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20119.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20155.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20155.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 22164 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 2600 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 25205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |