CA SB693 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 116 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Public contracts: local agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-05-02 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-04-13 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2011-04-08 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2011-04-07 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-10 | Set for hearing April 12. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 5956.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 116 | Amended Code | Citation Text |