CA SB69 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1203.067 and 3008 of, and to add Section 645.5 to, the Penal Code, relating to sex offenders.
Title
Sex offenders: GPS monitoring: removal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-04-2017]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-04-2017]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2018-01-09 | Senate | January 9 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 4006.) |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Set for hearing January 9. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | April 4 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 598.) Reconsideration granted. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-01-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 5. |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1203.067 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 3008 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 645.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |