CA SB689 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 121349 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Needle and syringe exchange programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-25-2019]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | April 24 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 849.) Reconsideration granted. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 121349 | Amended Code | Citation Text |