CA SB689 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 987.005 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans housing.
Title
Veterans: housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Huff [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Transportation and Housing (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | April 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 596.) (April 14). |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Coms. on V.A. and T. & H. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and V.A. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 987.005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |