CA SB685 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-21 - June 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-21 - June 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19431 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to horse racing.
Title
California Horse Racing Board: public records: votes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB685 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | Assembly | June 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1074.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 827.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19431 | Amended Code | Citation Text |