CA SB684 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 246, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1368.1 and 1370 of the Penal Code, and to amend Section 5008 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to criminal trial.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Incompetence to stand trial: conservatorship: treatment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-24 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # SB684 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-20 - Assembly - SB 684 Bates Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB684 Bates (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 246, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-11 Approved by the Governor.
2017-08-30SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-08-24SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2233.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-08-22SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-07-20SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-07-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 2634.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-07-17AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-07-13AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-07-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11).
2017-07-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-06-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1346.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-10SenatePublished May 9 at 9 p.m.
2017-05-10SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-09SenateOrdered to second reading.
2017-05-09SenateRead third time and amended.
2017-05-08SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-04SenateOrdered to second reading.
2017-05-04SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-04-25SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 749.) (April 18).
2017-03-23SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1368.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1370Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code5008Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback