CA SB682 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 25 @ 10:00 am in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 2196 of the Elections Code, relating to voting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Online voter registration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-16SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2017-05-11SenateMay 15 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 858.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-21SenateSet for hearing April 25 in T. & H. pending receipt.
2017-04-20SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-04-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 744.) (April 18).
2017-04-07SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2017-04-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2017-04-05SenateRe-referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and T. & H.
2017-03-28SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code2196Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback