CA SB682 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-09 - From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-09 - From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to the California State University, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
California State University: student enrollment.
Sponsors
Sen. Ricardo Lara [D] | Sen. Marty Block [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] |
Sen. Ellen Corbett [D] | Sen. Lou Correa [D] | Sen. Noreen Evans [D] | Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] |
Sen. Alex Padilla [D] | Sen. Norma Torres [D] | Asm. Paul Fong [D] | Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Asm. Dan Logue [R] | Sen. Mike Morrell [R] | Asm. Brian Nestande [R] | Asm. Kristin Olsen [R] |
Asm. Manuel Perez [D] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] | Asm. Das Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-09 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Higher Education (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB682 Lara (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB682 Lara (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2013-08-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-26 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1040.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 880.) (May 8). |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 60053 | New Code | See Bill Text |