CA SB680 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 100, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 29010.3 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

San Francisco Bay Area Rapid Transit District

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-06 - Assembly - SB 680 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By GRAYSON (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB680 Wieckowski (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-21 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 100, Statutes of 2017.
2017-07-21 Approved by the Governor.
2017-07-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
2017-07-06SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-07-06AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 14. Page 2471.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-06-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 26).
2017-06-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2017-04-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-04-24SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 802.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-04-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 751.) (April 18).
2017-04-07SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2017-03-27SenateMarch 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-21SenateSet for hearing March 28.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code29010.3Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback