CA SB68 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 720, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 720, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25711.5 of, and to add Section 25233.5 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Building electrification and electric vehicle charging.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-10 - Assembly - SB 68 Becker Senate Third Reading By Carrillo (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB68 Becker et al. Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Assembly - SB 68 Becker Senate Third Reading By Carrillo (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB68 Becker (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB68 Becker et al. Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Assembly - SB 68 Becker Senate Third Reading By Carrillo (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB68 Becker (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 720, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 2642.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 3159.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 18. Page 2851.) |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-07 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. | |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2599.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | July 14 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-30 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 1279.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1181.) (May 20). |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 2. Page 842.) (April 19). |
2021-04-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and JUD. |
2021-03-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-12-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 25233.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 25711.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |