CA SB68 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 25150.7 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous waste.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hazardous waste: treated wood waste.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB68 Galgiani Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 68 Galgiani Senate Third Reading By Holden (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - 06/18/19 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB68 Galgiani (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-29 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2020-09-29 Vetoed by the Governor.
2020-09-09SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-08-31SenateOrdered to unfinished business.
2020-08-31SenateFrom special consent calendar on motion of Senator Grove.
2020-08-31SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2020-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2020-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-25AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2020-08-25AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2020-08-25AssemblyFrom inactive file.
2020-08-25AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 and 78 suspended.
2020-08-24AssemblyNotice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Holden.
2019-09-11AssemblyOrdered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
2019-09-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2019-08-21AssemblyAugust 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-03AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18).
2019-06-10AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2019-06-04AssemblyJune 4 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-05-22AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2019-05-09AssemblyReferred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2019-04-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-04-25SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 818.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-22SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2019-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 549.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-08SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2019-03-08SenateMarch 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-02-12SenateSet for hearing March 20.
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on EQ.
2019-01-10SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9.
2019-01-09SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code25150.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback