CA SB679 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 597, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 597, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 26142 to the Public Resources Code, relating to energy, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Energy: energy conservation projects: financial
Sponsors
Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-02 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB679 Pavley (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-01 - Assembly - SB 679 Pavley Senate Third Reading By FLETCHER (Y: 69 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Utilities and Commerce (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB679 Pavley (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-01 - Assembly - SB 679 Pavley Senate Third Reading By FLETCHER (Y: 69 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Utilities and Commerce (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB679 Pavley (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 597, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2011-09-02 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2273.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-09-01 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-09-01 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 6. Page 2779.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-26 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (August 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-17 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-08-15 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-11 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Report received | |
2011-07-08 | pursuant to J.R. 61(a)(10).) | |
2011-06-29 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 27). | |
2011-06-16 | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & C. | |
2011-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1270.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-31 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1121.) (May 26). | |
2011-05-20 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2011-05-09 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-03 | Set for hearing May 9. | |
2011-04-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 808.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-17 | Set for hearing April 28. | |
2011-03-16 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-15 | Set for hearing April 5. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 25416.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 26140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26142 | New Code | See Bill Text |