CA SB678 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-08-26 - August 26 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 8257 of, and to add Chapter 8 (commencing with Section 8270) to Division 8 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to homelessness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unaccompanied Women Experiencing Homelessness Act of 2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB678 Rubio et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-26AssemblyAugust 26 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2021-07-14AssemblyJuly 14 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2021-07-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2021-06-23AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-05-28AssemblyReferred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and HUM. S.
2021-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-05-24SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1234.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1200.) (May 20).
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-04SenateMay 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 3.
2021-04-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 815.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 15.
2021-03-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 590.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
2021-03-09SenateSet for hearing March 23.
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and HOUSING.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-22SenateRead first time.
2021-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2021-02-19SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code8257Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code8270New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback