CA SB673 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 51934 and 51938 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
Comprehensive sexual health education and human immunodeficiency virus (HIV) prevention education.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Morrell [R] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Ling Ling Chang [R] | Asm. James Gallagher [R] |
Sen. Shannon Grove [R] | Sen. Brian Jones [R] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2020-01-15 | Senate | January 15 set for final hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 3098.) |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Set for hearing January 15. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | April 24 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | April 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51934 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 51938 | Amended Code | Citation Text |