CA SB673 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 611, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 611, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 25200.21 and 25200.23 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous waste.
Title
Hazardous waste.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB673 Lara Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Assembly - SB 673 Lara Senate Third Reading By SANTIAGO (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB673 Lara Motions (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Assembly - SB 673 Lara Senate Third Reading By SANTIAGO (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB673 Lara Motions (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 611, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 2754.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 3095.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27). |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 1192.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1158.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 859.) (April 29). |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25187.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25199.20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25200.21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25200.23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 40001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |