CA SB667 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 357, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 357, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 2608 and 2627 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to disability.
Title
Disability insurance: eligibility: waiting period.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-01 - Assembly - SB 667 Jackson Senate Third Reading By DALY (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB667 Jackson (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB667 Jackson (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 357, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:45 p.m. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2721.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1119.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | From special consent calendar on motion of Senator Jackson. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 884.) (May 4). |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 729.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Unemployment Insurance Code | 2608 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 2627 | Amended Code | Citation Text |