CA SB664 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-10 - Re-referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Privacy and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-10 - Re-referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Privacy and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 27565 and 31490 of the Streets and Highways Code, and to amend Sections 23302.5 and 40267 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 40254 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Electronic toll and transit fare collection systems.
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Asm. Tom Daly [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committees on [Transportation] and [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB664 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committees on [Transportation] and [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB664 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 28). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-08-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | (Received at desk July 17 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)). |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 9). |
2019-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and P. & C.P. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 824.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 524.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 27565 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 31490 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 23302.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 40254 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 40267 | Amended Code | Citation Text |